Financial history UKRAINE CHRISTIAN PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1144824
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £42.32k £46.71k £43.58k £37.15k £11.71k
Total expenditure £54.68k £50.91k £38.83k £14.96k £9.68k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A