Accounts and annual returns NAMAL COLLEGE

Charity number: 1144897
Charity reporting is up to date (151 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 March 2022 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 March 2022 151 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 March 2022 516 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 March 2022 516 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 March 2022 882 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 31 March 2022 882 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 08 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 08 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 08 February 2018 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 08 February 2018 100 days late Download Open in new window