Financial history HUNTINGTON'S DISEASE YOUTH ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1145781
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £126.04k £142.63k £238.24k £202.04k £104.12k
Total expenditure £115.30k £126.89k £131.75k £205.85k £85.47k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A