Trustees AFONYDD CYMRU CYFYNGEDIG

Charity number: 1145675
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
The Viscount Christopher Mills Chair 18 July 2019
None on record
Harriet Alvis Trustee 07 October 2022
None on record
Dr Robin Parry Trustee 09 June 2022
ELUSEN DYFFRYN PERIS SCE
Received: On time
North Wales Rivers Trust Ltd
Received: On time
THE R H OWEN MEMORIAL FUND OR CRONFA GOFFA R H OWEN
Received: On time
Joseph Max Pimblett Trustee 06 August 2021
None on record
Peter Powell Trustee 18 January 2021
None on record
Creighton Harvey Trustee 15 December 2019
None on record
Simon Charles Ansell Evans Trustee 15 April 2016
None on record
Anthony Rees MBE Trustee 11 November 2011
SOUTH EAST WALES RIVERS TRUST
Received: On time