LONDON CHURCH LEADERS

Charity number: 1145750
Charity reporting is overdue by 227 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 227 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 227 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 13 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 17 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 25 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 24 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 24 October 2016 On time Download