Accounts and annual returns SUTTON BOXING & FIRE FIT ACADEMY
Charity number: 1145680

Charity reporting is overdue by 1617 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 156 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 156 days | |
Annual return | 01 September 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 521 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 521 days | |
Annual return | 01 September 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 886 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 886 days | |
Annual return | 01 September 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1251 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1251 days | |
Annual return | 01 September 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1617 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1617 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window