RENEWAL NORTH WEST

Charity number: 1145056
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Renewal North West is a Christian charity set up to help the long term unemployed break down barriers that stop them from gaining employment such as addiction, homelessness, lack of education and opportunity. We provide work experience and skills development as well as accommodation enabling people to rebuild their lives. We also provide low cost household items to those who need them.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East
  • Cheshire West & Chester
  • Derbyshire
  • Lancashire
  • Manchester City
  • Stockport
  • Tameside

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 December 2011: Standard registration
  • 17 May 2012: Funds received from 1109278 RENEWAL (NORTH WEST)
  • 13 February 2019: Funds received from 1097219 THE FURNITURE STATION
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ATHOLL STUART GORDON Chair 29 November 2011
TRUST PROPERTY IN CONNEXION WITH THE GOSPEL HALL
Received: On time
Angela Newall Trustee 02 November 2019
None on record
Sharon Rebekah Durrant Trustee 19 November 2018
None on record
Samuel Davies Trustee 19 November 2018
None on record
DERRETT JAMES WATTS Trustee 30 December 2014
BIBLE EDUCATIONAL SERVICES
Received: On time
PARK EVANGELICAL CHURCH
Received: On time
Craig Ross Maffey Trustee 30 December 2014
None on record
Andrew Paul Dutton Trustee 30 December 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £253.09k £212.48k £303.56k £456.91k £583.39k
Total expenditure £275.28k £184.12k £229.67k £349.63k £392.49k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £121.97k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £266.94k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £269.45k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £46.60k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £405
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £38.21k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £354.28k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £423.11k
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Other assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £282.15k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A N/A £8.82k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 02 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 04 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 24 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 17 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
63,SHAW HEATH
STOCKPORT
CHESHIRE
SK3 8BH
Phone:
01614762777