ISLE OF WIGHT FOODBANK

Charity number: 1144644
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £59.83k £67.04k £91.04k £104.44k £248.15k
Total expenditure £61.94k £65.07k £76.09k £81.23k £134.82k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £32.43k