Accounts and annual returns LONDON ALL NATIONS KOREAN PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH

Charity number: 1144932
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 November 2021 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

19 November 2021 19 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 July 2021 270 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 July 2021 270 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 July 2021 636 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 July 2021 636 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 July 2021 999 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 26 July 2021 999 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 July 2021 1359 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 21 July 2021 1359 days late Download Open in new window