WEST LONDON BANGLADESHI ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1149529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 March 2021 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 25 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 15 June 2017 135 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required