WEST LONDON BANGLADESHI ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1149529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.09k £2.51k £1.70k £1.34k £210
Total expenditure £963 £2.58k £1.47k £2.71k £660
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A