Accounts and annual returns FLINTSHIRE FOODBANK

Charity number: 1146921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 February 2021 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 18 March 2020 47 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 February 2018 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 12 February 2018 12 days late Download Open in new window