Financial history FLINTSHIRE FOODBANK

Charity number: 1146921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £66.29k £66.29k £92.79k £122.60k £279.86k
Total expenditure £52.42k £52.42k £73.38k £72.40k £92.71k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £7.17k