Financial history PORTSMOUTH DIOCESAN COUNCIL FOR SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY

Charity number: 1145162
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £582.42k £240.67k £246.71k £241.68k £214.45k
Total expenditure £245.25k £252.76k £283.05k £240.70k £192.31k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £147.02k £113.43k
Income - Donations and legacies £165.55k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £23.14k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £45.76k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £347.96k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £245.25k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A