MARKYATE BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1145170
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 15 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 11 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 11 May 2017 On time Download