AL MAJIDIAH TRUST

Charity number: 1147811
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/08/2016 30/08/2017 30/08/2018 30/08/2019 30/08/2020
Total gross income £6.53k £150 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £6.03k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A