CIKOKO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cikoko provides funding for the advancement of education by supporting remote, rural community schools in Zambia. Funds will be applied to: - Teachers salaries - Teacher training - School equipment and materials - Set work books and stationery - Library development - School infrastructure development and improvements - Scholarship Awards to support the further education of pupils
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Zambia
Governance
- 19 January 2012: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Lauder | Trustee | 01 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL KAY NICHOLLS | Trustee | 19 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
NICKOLAS ANTONIUS TRUYENS | Trustee | 19 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM ANDREW SMITH | Trustee | 06 December 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.99k | £40.43k | £1.13k | £8.55k | £6.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.52k | £22.37k | £9.69k | £8.18k | £5.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 January 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 08 November 2019 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 08 November 2019 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 09 January 2018 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 JAN 2011
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF FUNDING TO SUPPORT EDUCATION IN ZAMBIAN RURAL ARES, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION, IN THE MUKAMBI COMMUNITY SCHOOL, KAFUE NATIONAL PARK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 12
Papermill Wharf
50 Narrow Street
LONDON
E14 8BZ
- Phone:
- 07868151002
- Email:
- nicktruyens@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window