Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY MAGDALEN, OXFORD
Charity number: 1145027
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Lucie Spiers | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Dr Robert Anthony Saunders | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Henry William Jestico | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Dr Georgina Paul | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Fleur Beauvais Jensen Taylor | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Dr Melanie Kirsten Marshall | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||
Deborah Eleanor Vorhies | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||
Dr Veronica West-Harling | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Nancy-Jane Rucker | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rev Esther DaPonte Brazil | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Dr Matthew Robert Irvine Schrecker | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Ashley James Walters | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||
Gareth Richard Price Jones | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Charl Andries Morrison Engela | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
William James Barnaby Dawes | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Gillian Hamnett | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|||||||||||||
Nigel Frederick Ernest Timms | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|||||||||||||
JOYCE ANN DAY | Trustee | 13 December 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Susan Elizabeth Purver | Trustee | 13 December 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rev Peter John Groves | Trustee | 11 December 2011 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.