ROCK BAPTIST CHAPEL MANSE FUND

Charity number: 502407
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required