ROCK BAPTIST CHAPEL MANSE FUND

Charity number: 502407
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £9.88k £5.18k £2.87k £7.62k £8.83k
Total expenditure £8.67k £9.45k £5.78k £78.37k £34.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A