Accounts and annual returns AVANTI WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1145546
Charity reporting is overdue by 116 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 116 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 116 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 November 2022 297 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 March 2021 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 March 2021 424 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required