Financial history SURFERS AGAINST SEWAGE

Charity number: 1145877
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.01m £1.17m £1.52m £2.33m £1.65m
Total expenditure £949.41k £946.26k £1.26m £1.78m £1.24m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £25.00k £35.00k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £39.36k
Income - Donations and legacies £535.08k £550.95k £871.76k £1.35m £892.69k
Income - Other trading activities £163.20k £149.21k £167.87k £135.36k £51.97k
Income - Charitable activities £311.51k £468.12k £477.54k £843.85k £700.34k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £58 £0 £0 £2.57k £923
Income - Other £0 £3.41k £3.01k £227 £79
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £1.03k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £894.86k £867.50k £1.09m £1.61m £1.09m
Expenditure - Raising funds £54.54k £78.77k £168.08k £171.27k £148.80k
Expenditure - Governance £6.00k £8.11k £14.13k £21.45k £21.45k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0