STRATFORD ARTS TRUST

Charity number: 1145183
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.31m £1.32m £1.58m £1.45m £1.02m
Total expenditure £1.39m £1.37m £1.47m £1.54m £921.85k
Income from government contracts £0 £50.00k £46.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £82.06k £15.00k £20.00k £93.30k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £533.98k £557.33k £688.38k £711.00k £811.59k
Income - Other trading activities £105.35k £0 £165.32k £109.89k £0
Income - Charitable activities £670.20k £760.16k £728.32k £632.99k £212.60k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £13.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.36m £722.94k £827.56k £1.54m £921.85k
Expenditure - Raising funds £34.92k £0 £41.96k £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £10.00k £16.15k £8.86k £9.40k £11.35k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £650.95k £604.38k £0 £0