Trustees FAVERSHAM CREEK TRUST
Charity number: 1146660
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philippa Frances Dickenson | Chair | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kristyna Hill | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Orville Anthony Wright | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Tootell | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew John Sweeney | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Susan Wood | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN AKHURST | Trustee | 23 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELDON CROSSLAND-HINCHLIFFE | Trustee | 16 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
MRS GRISELDA MUSSETT | Trustee | 19 December 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.