THE FROEBEL TRUST

Charity number: 1145128
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 12 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 13 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 13 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 28 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 10 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 12 April 2017 On time Download