Financial history ZUMURATU-LI-MUMEEN ASSOCIATION MANCHESTER UK

Charity number: 1145231
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £21.00k £18.00k £12.00k £5.50k £0
Total expenditure £8.50k £12.00k £9.50k £3.50k £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A