Accounts and annual returns HARWOOD METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1145702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 27 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 27 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 27 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 26 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 26 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 21 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window