Financial history HARWOOD METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1145702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £193.84k £104.95k £102.10k £749.02k £1.00m
Total expenditure £78.98k £90.75k £87.94k £856.09k £988.12k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £46.42k £44.22k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £702.10k £960.25k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £509 £250
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £856.09k £988.12k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £600
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £513
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0