Trustees HARWOOD METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1145702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

27 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL HAWKSWORTH Trustee 01 June 2020
THE METHODIST CHURCH - BOLTON CIRCUIT
Received: On time
LEARN (LIFECHANGING EDUCATION FOR ALL IN RURAL NEPAL)
Received: On time
UPLIFTING NEPAL'S CHILDREN WITH LOVE AND EDUCATION
Received: On time
Elizabeth Ann Smith Trustee 04 June 2017
THE METHODIST CHURCH - BOLTON CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Dawn Tracy Louise Stirzaker Murphy Trustee 19 March 2017
None on record
MAUREEN HAWKSWORTH Trustee 22 February 2015
THE METHODIST CHURCH - BOLTON CIRCUIT
Received: On time
LEARN (LIFECHANGING EDUCATION FOR ALL IN RURAL NEPAL)
Received: On time
UPLIFTING NEPAL'S CHILDREN WITH LOVE AND EDUCATION
Received: On time
Graham Smith Trustee 22 February 2015
THE METHODIST CHURCH - BOLTON CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Alison Unsworth Trustee 22 February 2015
None on record
Carole Horrocks Trustee 22 February 2015
None on record
Ian Vickers Trustee 22 February 2015
None on record
Matthew Smith Trustee 20 February 2014
None on record
Mrs S Marfell-Cadman Trustee 20 February 2014
None on record
Ms Kirstin Middleton Trustee 20 February 2014
None on record
LORNA ANNE SMALLMAN Trustee 31 January 2012
THE METHODIST CHURCH - BOLTON CIRCUIT
Received: On time
MARY ELIZABETH RILEY Trustee 31 January 2012
THE METHODIST CHURCH - BOLTON CIRCUIT
Received: On time
JOYCE MARY BOOTH Trustee 31 January 2012
None on record
SUSAN JAYNE SNOWDEN CERT.ED Trustee 31 January 2012
None on record
JANE CHRISTINE SWEETLOVE Trustee 31 January 2012
None on record
PAMELA MARGARET MARSHALL Trustee 31 January 2012
None on record
KATHLEEN PATRICIA PENDLEBURY Trustee 31 January 2012
None on record
JENNIFER ANN LIGGAT Trustee 31 January 2012
None on record
FREDA HILTON Trustee 31 January 2012
None on record
KEITH ANTHONY DARLINGTON Trustee 31 January 2012
None on record
JEAN MARY MATHER Trustee 31 January 2012
None on record
IAN RICHARD SLACK BSC Trustee 31 January 2012
None on record
Peter Green Trustee 04 January 2012
THE METHODIST CHURCH - BOLTON CIRCUIT
Received: On time
SIMEON CENTRE COUNSELLING SERVICE
Received: On time
ELAINE PLATT BED LSGM Trustee 04 January 2012
THE METHODIST CHURCH - BOLTON CIRCUIT
Received: On time
GILLIAN PLATT OBE Trustee 04 January 2012
None on record
JEAN GERRARD Trustee 04 January 2012
None on record