Accounts and annual returns WORLD ENLIGHTERS MINISTRIES {WEM}

Charity number: 1145687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 November 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 455 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required