Financial history WORLD ENLIGHTERS MINISTRIES {WEM}

Charity number: 1145687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £22.45k £16.02k £20.88k £29.81k £12.69k
Total expenditure £21.71k £23.72k £16.80k £28.69k £11.96k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A