UNIVERSITY OF SUNDERLAND STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1148212
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £1.54m £1.25m £1.20m £1.10m £1.09m
Total expenditure £1.48m £1.15m £961.56k £1.06m £984.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.23m £1.09m £1.06m £974.00k £987.52k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £310.00k £160.25k £139.38k £121.45k £98.01k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.27k £195 £736 £2.18k £2.12k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.43m £1.15m £961.56k £996.48k £984.15k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £27.09k £27.66k £0 £20.45k £22.68k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £49.57k £0 £0 £63.60k £0