Trustees UNIVERSITY OF SUNDERLAND STUDENTS' UNION
Charity number: 1148212
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Charmaine Rutendo Kubwalo | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sorochukwu George Cosmas | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Richardson | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prince Chinedu Ikechi | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oluwatosin Ayomikun Solarin | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oludolapo Dada | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Badr Adnani | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Fogarty | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kayleigh Tague | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oladimeji Adepoju | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Christopher lawley-Powell | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rose Guy | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Edward O'Brien | Trustee | 03 January 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.