Financial history WHITE ROCK ROSE LIMITED

Charity number: 1145186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £400.59k £246.33k £0 £331.06k £283.05k
Total expenditure £319.49k £298.22k £1.00k £332.06k £281.05k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A