Accounts and annual returns RAZA ISLAMIC EDUCATION AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1147125
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2023 19 March 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 19 March 2024 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 22 February 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 22 February 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 09 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 16 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 07 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 13 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window