WHEELIES SPORT AND ACTIVITY CLUB

Charity number: 1145417
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 11 January 2020 20 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 11 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 11 January 2019 20 October 2020 344 days late
Accounts and TAR 11 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 11 January 2018 07 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 11 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 11 January 2017 08 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 11 January 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 11 January 2016 09 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 11 January 2016 Not Required