WHEELIES SPORT AND ACTIVITY CLUB

Charity number: 1145417
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 11/01/2017 11/01/2018 11/01/2019 11/01/2020 11/01/2021
Total gross income £32.91k £4.45k £6.82k £18.46k £1.83k
Total expenditure £12.50k £20.27k £14.61k £3.39k £1.02k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A