WHEELIES SPORT AND ACTIVITY CLUB

Charity number: 1145417
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jason Peter Hill Trustee 01 March 2014 None on record
Iain Kerr Douglas Chair 01 March 2014 None on record
TIM COLLINS Trustee 12 December 2011 None on record
CARLA MARIE WOODS Trustee 03 June 2017 None on record
David Alexander Henderson Trustee 16 October 2020 None on record
Stephen Ruscoe Trustee 11 May 2019 None on record
Daisy Lee Trustee 03 June 2017 None on record
Philippa Carmel O'Neil Trustee 09 April 2016 None on record
WAYNE TREVOR NEWTON Trustee 12 December 2011 None on record