LIGHT PROJECT PRO INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1146590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £43.17k £92.06k £48.44k £62.36k £70.42k
Total expenditure £43.89k £87.14k £46.34k £61.05k £73.79k
Income from government contracts £20.57k £40.00k N/A N/A £15.00k
Income from government grants £20.57k £50.00k £15.00k £26.50k £5.00k