Financial history MID PENNINE ARTS

Charity number: 1145521
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £322.09k £230.13k £207.55k £171.05k £185.35k
Total expenditure £328.35k £231.76k £207.23k £170.11k £156.19k
Income from government contracts £31.22k £17.59k £19.77k £4.81k N/A
Income from government grants £26.30k £15.25k £29.13k £45.13k £128.68k