Trustees MID PENNINE ARTS

Charity number: 1145521
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Stephanie Kate Hawke Chair 01 October 2013
None on record
Christopher Peter Moss Trustee 19 March 2022
None on record
Lesley Giddins Trustee 17 March 2022
STREET LEAGUE
Received: On time
Kelda Lorraine Savage Trustee 17 March 2022
None on record
Faye Elizabeth Wetherall Trustee 17 March 2022
None on record
Amber Victoria Corns Trustee 25 June 2020
None on record
Claire Tymon Trustee 23 July 2015
None on record
Fareda Khan Trustee 15 November 2013
None on record
ANDY MACNAE Trustee 18 January 2012
None on record
PETER JOHN KENYON Trustee 12 January 2012
None on record