PENNINE MENCAP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide support and activities for adults with learning disabilities and other associated impairments within the Greater Manchester boroughs of Oldham, Tameside, Rochdale and Bury.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bury
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Tameside
Governance
- 26 March 2012: Standard registration
- 21 March 2014: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 21 March 2014: Funds transferred to 1150285 PENNINE MENCAP
- FORMERLY TAMESIDE FAMILY CARERS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 16 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 15 October 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/02/2012
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF HELP AND SUPPORT FOR THEM AND FOR THEIR FAMILIES, DEPENDANTS AND CARERS AND TO PREVENT LEARNING DISABILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; AND (B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE JJME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED THEREOF BY REASON OF LEARNING DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. "LEARNING DISABILITY" MEANS ANY DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITY OF THE MIND AND ANY ASSOCIATED CONDITION HOWSOEVER CAUSED AND WHETHER MILD, MODERATE OR SEVERE.
Area of benefit
OLDHAM, ROCHDALE, BURY AND TAMESIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window