Accounts and annual returns THE ROCK CHURCH (WEST BRIDGFORD)
Charity number: 1145164

Charity reporting is overdue by 219 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 219 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 219 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 May 2022 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 May 2022 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 24 February 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 24 February 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 03 July 2019 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | 03 July 2019 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window