Financial history THE ROCK CHURCH (WEST BRIDGFORD)

Charity number: 1145164
Charity reporting is overdue by 218 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £263.88k £270.13k £327.64k £305.32k £168.29k
Total expenditure £218.73k £264.08k £256.74k £281.02k £238.27k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A