SHEERNESS ENHANCEMENT ASSOCIATION FOR LEISURE

Charity number: 1146477
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.44k £391 £432 £453 £0
Total expenditure £2.48k £3.76k £1.17k £1.04k £522
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A