Trustees HANDCRAFTED PROJECTS
Charity number: 1146188
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Bianchi | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Febrina Robinson | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Brady | Trustee | 14 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Buttanshaw | Trustee | 27 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD ALTY | Trustee | 01 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
NORMAN URWIN | Trustee | 04 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr PAUL MORLEY | Trustee | 04 January 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.