Financial history WOMEN'S EQUALITY NETWORK WALES

Charity number: 1145706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £99.71k £160.87k £159.35k £159.77k £157.05k
Total expenditure £99.49k £131.74k £143.97k £165.03k £155.35k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £87.93k £120.00k £114.36k £114.36k £145.00k