Trustees WOMEN'S EQUALITY NETWORK WALES

Charity number: 1145706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mary Ann Brocklesby Chair 16 November 2021
None on record
Linda Suzanne Davies Trustee 16 November 2021
IRIS PRIZE OUTREACH LIMITED
Received: On time
COLLEGES WALES / COLEGAU CYMRU
Received: On time
Rahila Hamid Trustee 16 November 2021
None on record
Jennifer Ramsay Trustee 16 November 2021
None on record
Tania Silva Marin Trustee 16 October 2020
None on record
Lowri Walters Trustee 16 October 2020
None on record
Wanjiku Ngotho-Mbugua Trustee 16 October 2020
None on record
Alison Williams Trustee 01 July 2019
None on record
Ruth Fowler Trustee 02 April 2019
None on record
Rhian Davies Trustee 14 December 2017
None on record