FARNHAM YOUTH CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Choral singing
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Bracknell Forest
- Hampshire
- Surrey
Governance
- 10 January 2012: Standard registration
- 16 June 2020: Funds received from 802779 FRIENDS OF FARNHAM YOUTH CHOIR
- FYC (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard John Fry | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Janet Ruthven | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gill Backhouse | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Helen West | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Liv Hancox MA | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.59k | £62.85k | £51.40k | £66.35k | £48.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.39k | £61.50k | £33.13k | £59.76k | £66.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 September 2023 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 21 September 2023 | 83 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/12/2011 as amended on 20 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF FYC SHALL BE TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE AND DEVELOP THE MUSICAL EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE FARNHAM AREA. THESE OBJECTS SHALL BE PURSUED THROUGH THE PROVISION OF CHORAL TRAINING TO CREATE AND MAINTAIN A YOUTH CHOIR OF THE HIGHEST MUSICAL STANDARDS WHICH MAY INCLUDE THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS, TOURS BOTH IN THE UK AND ABROAD, THE PRODUCTION OF RECORDINGS AND PARTICIPATION IN CHORAL COMPETITIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Abbot Road
GUILDFORD
Surrey
GU1 3TA
- Phone:
- 01252629234
- Email:
- info@fyc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window