Register of Charities - The Charity Commission GREENWICH GURKHA EX-SERVICEMEN ASSOCIATION
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charitable Activities during the period: 1. Celebrated Nepalese New Year Fri 13 Apr 2012. 2. Visited to Isle of Wight Sat 25 Aug 2012. 3. Celebrated Nepalese festival Tihar on Fri 02 Nov 2012. 4. Attended the Armed forces day on Sat 30 Jun 2012 and Remembrance Day on Sun 11 Nov 2012.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2022
People
9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.